G.D. v. KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: G.D.
Defendant: KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION, MADISON PEELE and JOSHUA SAIN
Case Number: 1:2022cv01001
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand of Peele & Sain in their individual capacities by MADISON PEELE, JOSHUA SAIN. (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Submitted #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Winchester, Robin)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (Winchester, Robin)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Second Motion for Extension of Time. KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION shall answer or otherwise respond by 02/09/2023. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/19/2023. (AULD, L.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GUMM, STEPHANIE)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 1/9/2023; that the GAL Motion (Docket Entry #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a properly supported request for appointment of a guardian ad litem. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for MADISON PEELE and JOSHUA SAIN. Answer due by 1/19/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/29/2022. (Brubaker, John)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MADISON PEELE, JOSHUA SAIN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GUMM, STEPHANIE)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE L. GUMM on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA SAIN (GUMM, STEPHANIE)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE L. GUMM on behalf of Defendant MADISON PEELE (GUMM, STEPHANIE)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION to 1/19/2023. Answer due by 1/19/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/19/2022. (Brubaker, John)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GUMM, STEPHANIE)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE L. GUMM on behalf of Defendant KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION (GUMM, STEPHANIE)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #3 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Winchester, Robin)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to JOSHUA SAIN per request of Plaintiff's Attorneys due to corrected address. (Carter, Alexus) Modified on 12/14/2022 to include additional docket text. (Carter, Alexus).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - MADISON PEELE, #2 Summons - JOSHUA SAIN, #3 Summons - JOSHUA SAIN (2)) (Carter, Alexus)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Plaintiff G.D. (JESSUP, ROBERT)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Plaintiff G.D. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (WEBBER, BROOKE) Modified on 11/22/2022 to include full title of motion. (Carter, Alexus)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BROOKE E. WEBBER on behalf of Plaintiff G.D. (WEBBER, BROOKE)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3432688.), filed by G.D. by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Russell Johnson, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text, #2 Exhibit Statements)(JESSUP, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.D. v. KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.D.
Represented By: BROOKE E. WEBBER
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANNAPOLIS CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. GUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADISON PEELE
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. GUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA SAIN
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. GUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?