ANDERSON v. LEE et al
Plaintiff: ALBERT ANDERSON and ALBERT MARQUAVIOUSLAMAR ANDERSON
Defendant: LEE, SALISBURY CORR. INST., RITHIE, HONEYCUTT, ELLISON, BEN ANDERSON, WILLIAM GLICK, MERCEDES FORDHAM, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, BOYD BENNETT, TODD ISHEE, MENTAL HEALTH SOCIAL WORKER, CARTER, MEDICAL PROVIDER, SARGENT CHEEKS, BLACKMAN, LOWERY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 1, ROY COOPER, ERIK A. HOOKS, TIMOTHY D. MOOSE and BRANDESHAWN HARRIS
Case Number: 1:2022cv01097
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 02/09/2023 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action be FILED, that Plaintiff's Moton seeking a temporary restraining order is DENIED, (ECF No. #2 ), and this action is DISMISSED sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which correct the defects cited in the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. (Garland, Leah)
February 2, 2023 CASE REFERRED RE: #10 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS (Blay, Debbie)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2023. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 1/26/2023. (Taylor, Abby)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/09/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion (Docket Entry #3 ) seeking a mental evaluation, Motion (Docket Entry #4 ) seeking to file an exhibit, Motion (Docket Entry #5 ) seeking a court order related to his mental health records, and Motion (Docket Entry #6 ) seeking an appointment of counsel are denied without prejudice. RECOMMENDED that this action be filed, that Plaintiff's Motion (Docket Entry #2 ) seeking a temporary restraining order be denied, and this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (Taylor, Abby)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #3 Motion ; denying #4 Motion ; denying #5 Motion ; denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/09/2023.(Taylor, Abby)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Plaintiff ALBERT ANDERSON. (Butler, Carol)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ALBERT ANDERSON. (Butler, Carol)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by ALBERT ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)
December 20, 2022 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
December 20, 2022 Case Assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Butler, Carol)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ALBERT ANDERSON. (Carter, Alexus)
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION entitled "MOTION FOR COURT ORDER" by ALBERT ANDERSON. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2023. (Carter, Alexus)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION entitled "MOTION TO PURPOSE" by ALBERT ANDERSON. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2023. (Carter, Alexus)
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION entitled "MOTION FOR EXISTENCE OF INSANITY DETERMINATION" by ALBERT ANDERSON. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2023. (Carter, Alexus)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Injunction Relief by ALBERT ANDERSON. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Carter, Alexus)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ALBERT ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. LEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT MARQUAVIOUSLAMAR ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALISBURY CORR. INST.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYCUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES FORDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOYD BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ISHEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTAL HEALTH SOCIAL WORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PROVIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARGENT CHEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK A. HOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY D. MOOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDESHAWN HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?