OSBORNE et al v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC et al
Plaintiff: CARROL A. OSBORNE, DEBRA SALANT, RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR. and TAYJES SHAH
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., THOMAS P. SCHMALZRIED, MD and DOES 1-100 inclusive
Case Number: 1:2023cv00134
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2023 Filing 40 Consent MOTION to Change Date of Hearing Scheduled for April 28, 2023 by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/29/2023, that the Motion to Withdraw [Doc. #36 ] is GRANTED, and Alexander Calfos appearance is terminated. (Bowers, Alexis)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/29/2023, that the Motion to Withdraw [Doc. #31 ] is GRANTED, and Kelly Olahs appearance is terminated. (Bowers, Alexis)
March 28, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:22-cv-01148 , 1:22-cv-01150 and 1:22-vb-01149 filed by RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR. filed by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. Replies due by 4/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Weatherly Implant Product ID, #2 Exhibit Campbell Implant Product ID, #3 Exhibit Holland Implant Product ID, #4 Exhibit O'Connell Implant Product ID, #5 Exhibit Weatherly Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit O'Connell Dr. Stanley Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit Holland Crowninshield Report, #8 Exhibit Weatherly Gilbert Report, #9 Exhibit Penrod Declaration, #10 Exhibit Burstein Weatherly Report, #11 Exhibit Burstein Campbell Report, #12 Exhibit Burstein Holland Report, #13 Exhibit Burstein O'Connell Report)(WELLS, DIXIE)
March 27, 2023 Motion No Longer Submitted #35 JOINT MOTIONfor Status Conference to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
March 27, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #35 JOINT MOTIONfor Status Conference, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
March 27, 2023 TEXT ORDER issued by JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 3/27/23 this case is set for a Status Conference, Scheduling Conference, and Hearing on the Motion to Consolidate on Friday, April 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. at the Federal Courthouse in Winston Salem, North Carolina Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE, granting #35 Joint Motion for Status Conference. (Garrett, Kim)
March 14, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Alexander G. Calfo, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
March 14, 2023 Motion Submitted: #35 JOINT MOTIONfor Status Conference to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
March 13, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander G. Calfo by on behalf of DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE) Modified on 3/13/2023 to reflect which attorney is withdrawing (Bowers, Alexis).
March 13, 2023 Filing 35 JOINT MOTIONfor Status Conference by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (WELLS, DIXIE)
March 8, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE by RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR re #33 Memorandum,,, Certificate of Word Count (SHAH, TAYJES)
March 8, 2023 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR re #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:22-cv-01148 , 1:22-cv-01150 and 1:22-vb-01149 filed by RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V)(SHAH, TAYJES)
March 8, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:22-cv-01148 , 1:22-cv-01150 and 1:22-vb-01149 by RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR. Response to Motion due by 3/29/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAH, TAYJES)
March 7, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Kelley S. Olah, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
March 6, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Kelley S. Olah by on behalf of DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE) Modified on 3/6/2023 to reflect which attorney is withdrawing. (Bowers, Alexis).
March 2, 2023 Filing 30 Envelope Containing #24 ECF 30 Day Notice addressed to ALEXANDER G. CALFO, KING & SPALDING, 333 S. GRAND AVENUE, SUITE 4200, LOS ANGELES, CA 90071 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because NO LONGER AT THIS ADDRESS. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Bowers, Alexis)
February 27, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney TAYJES SHAH on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3504285.) (SHAH, TAYJES) Modified on 2/28/2023 to correct who the attorney is appearing for. (Bowers, Alexis).
February 24, 2023 Filing 28 Reply BRIEF In Support of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Expert Diana Medlin by Defendants DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. filed by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (WELLS, DIXIE)
February 20, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS on behalf of Defendants DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. (WELLS, DIXIE)
February 15, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRIAN L. KINSLEY on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR (KINSLEY, BRIAN)
February 15, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Bowers, Alexis)
February 14, 2023 Filing 24 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney Margaret Dicke. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 3/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Atty Hoke, #2 Notice to Atty Calfo, #3 Notice to Atty Olah, #4 Notice to Atty Norton) (Bowers, Alexis)
February 13, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis)
February 13, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Bowers, Alexis)
February 10, 2023 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:13-cv-02194. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, and in the interests of justice, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina.; granting #20 MOTION to Transfer Case. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 20 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Curtis Hoke on behalf of Plaintiff Richard H Weatherly, Jr (Attorney Curtis Hoke added to party Richard H Weatherly, Jr(pty:pla))(Hoke, Curtis) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, that the actions listed on the attached schedule be remanded to their respective transferor courts (see document for further details). Original document filed in Northern District of Texas at Dallas, case number 3:13-cv-02664-K, document #77, filed on 1/12/2023. (LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERK'S OFFICE ERROR) (Attachments: #1 Northern District of Texas Dallas Docket Sheet) (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 19, 2013 Filing 18 RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transferred from California Central has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:13-cv-01539 filed 04/19/2013. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 18, 2013 Filing 17 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Case extracted and transferred via electronically to USDC Northern District of Texas. (pj) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 16, 2013 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -131) by Jeffery N. Luthi Clerk of the Panel transferring case to Northern District of Texas. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 to the Northern District of Texas for the reasons stated in the order of May 23,2011, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade.. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (pj) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 10, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending the case transfer to MDL 2244 filed by defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, sets a status conference on May 30, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No.2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 13 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 4, 2013 Filing 12 PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 4/4/13: Initiating Documents. (mg) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 4, 2013 Filing 11 PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 4/4/13: Initiating Documents. (mg) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 4, 2013 Filing 10 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 4/4/13 addressed to acalfo@btlaw.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Judge for further proceedings. (mg) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 3, 2013 Filing 9 ANSWER filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Calfo, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 3, 2013 Filing 8 ANSWER filed by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Calfo, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 3, 2013 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas P Schmalzried MD answer now due 5/3/2013, filed by Defendant Thomas P Schmalzried MD.(Norton, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 11-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-02194 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
March 28, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc. Related Case(s): 13-02194 (Calfo, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
March 28, 2013 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc, served on March 28, 2013. (Calfo, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc, identifying Corporate Parent DePuy Inc, Other Affiliate Johnson and Johnson International for DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC499700 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID. ), filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc.(et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2013: #1 Ntc of Asgmt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 2/10/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSBORNE et al v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARROL A. OSBORNE
Represented By: MARGARET DICKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA SALANT
Represented By: MARGARET DICKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD H WEATHERLY, JR.
Represented By: CURTIS HOKE
Represented By: MARGARET DICKE
Represented By: TAYJES SHAH
Represented By: BRIAN L. KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYJES SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDER G. CALFO
Represented By: KELLEY S. OLAH
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON AND JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDER G. CALFO
Represented By: KELLEY S. OLAH
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS P. SCHMALZRIED, MD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. NORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?