SMITH v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: JOANNE SMITH
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Case Number: 1:2023cv00212
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/06/2023, that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective December 1, 2022. The Clerks office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (Bowers, Alexis)
April 6, 2023 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 6/5/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
March 16, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff JOANNE SMITH. (PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
March 12, 2023 TEXT ORDER (A) deferring ruling on #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, and (B) requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before 04/03/2023, a supplement to #2 Application, signed under oath or penalty of perjury, showing why the family members who, according to #2 Application, "cover [Plaintiff's] living expenses" cannot pay the fees or costs that pauper status otherwise would cover. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order shall result in the denial of #2 Application. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/12/2023. (AULD, L.)
March 10, 2023 Motions Referred: RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
March 10, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
March 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by JOANNE SMITH. (PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by JOANNE SMITH.(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE SMITH
Represented By: GEORGE C. PIEMONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?