BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION v. SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION
Defendant: SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00657
Filed: August 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Response Deadline re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) : Response to Motion due by 10/25/2024. (at)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule. For good cause shown, Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 25, 2024, to respond to Defendant SAS Retail Services, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 9/24/2024.(pl)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) by BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEVICOFF, EDWARD)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss). (ae)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW AS TO DIVERSITY JURISDICTION filed by Defendant SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC re #1 Petition for Removal filed by SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Response Deadline re: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss): Response to Motion due by 10/4/2024. (See 9/13/2024 Text Order) (lg)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Modify by BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 10/4/2024 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEVICOFF, EDWARD)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule. For good cause shown, Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 4, 2024, to respond to Defendant SAS Retail Services, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 9/13/2024.(pl)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #20 MOTION to Modify. (ae)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 09/12/2024, that SAS shall have no later than September 19, 2024, to file either an amended notice of removal which establishes jurisdiction on its face or a brief demonstrating why the original notice of removal or other information of record establishes diversity jurisdiction. If SAS files a brief, Plaintiff may file a responsive brief within five business days. Briefs shall be no longer than 5 pages. Failure to file an amended notice or a brief will result in remand of the case to the state court or other appropriate action without further notice. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that given the inquiry herein, and should subject matter jurisdiction exists, the Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing shall be continued to October 23, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Durham. (lg)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (See #19 Order) (lg)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Response Deadline re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) : Response to Motion due by 9/19/2024. (at)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 19, 2024, to respond to Defendant SAS Retail Services, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 8/28/2024.(pl)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) by BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LITTLE, J.)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss). (ae)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney EDWARD LEVICOFF on behalf of Plaintiff BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3894386.) (LEVICOFF, EDWARD)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/18/2024 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (kg)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) filed by SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL Motion to Dismiss) by SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2024 (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Complaint, with Jury Demand by SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BITCO CORP., Corporate Parent OLD REPUBLIC INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. for BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION.. (LITTLE, J.)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney J. MATTHEW LITTLE on behalf of Plaintiff BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION (LITTLE, J.)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(kag)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 24CV014990-400, issued 7/1/24, listed as Attachment 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal). (kag)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC, filed by BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 24CV014990-400, listed as Additional Attachment #5 to the #1 Petition for Removal). (kag)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc. d/b/a Advantage Solutions Inc. for SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC.. (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Petition for Removal and #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document - CORRECTED Exhibit B. (LEVY, DAVID) Modified on 8/9/2024 to link to correct documents. (kag)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (kag)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (kag)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KRISTY MARIE D'AMBROSIO on behalf of Defendant SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC (D'AMBROSIO, KRISTY)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DAVID L. LEVY on behalf of Defendant SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC (LEVY, DAVID)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Petition for Removal Exhibit B - State Court Complaint with Exhibits. (LEVY, DAVID)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3888951.), filed by SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Civil Cover Sheet & Summons)(LEVY, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION v. SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: J. MATTHEW LITTLE
Represented By: EDWARD LEVICOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS RETAIL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID L. LEVY
Represented By: KRISTY MARIE D'AMBROSIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?