CANOY et al v. THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HERMAN CANOY and AMY CANOY
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. and THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2024cv00892
Filed: October 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 12/23/2024; that the motion is GRANTED, and that Defendants have up to and through January 8, 2025, in which to respond to Plaintiff's response to Motion to Dismiss. (sh)
December 23, 2024 Motion Submitted: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS (db)
December 20, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SALUTA, GEMMA)
December 19, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, Certificate of Word Count by Plaintiffs AMY CANOY, HERMAN CANOY. (DUGGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
December 18, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Memorandum, filed by THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. filed by AMY CANOY, HERMAN CANOY. Replies due by 1/2/2025 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(DUGGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
December 17, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL DUGGAN on behalf of Plaintiffs AMY CANOY, HERMAN CANOY (DUGGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HURST, HALEY)
November 27, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Denial Letter)(HURST, HALEY)
October 28, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HURST, HALEY)
October 28, 2024 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint by THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HURST, HALEY)
October 28, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (sh)
October 28, 2024 Filing 8 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney CHRISTOPHER M. DUGGAN. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 11/27/2024. (sh)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY and THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. Answer due by 12/1/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/28/2024. (jsb)
October 28, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (sh)
October 28, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (sh)
October 25, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (State Court documents originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 24CVS003394-120, issued 9/17/2024, listed as Exhibit 2 to #1 Petition for Removal.) (sh)
October 25, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AMY CANOY, HERMAN CANOY. (State Court documents originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 24CVS003394-120, listed as Exhibit 3 to #1 Petition for Removal.) (sh)
October 25, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney HALEY KRISTINE HURST on behalf of Defendants THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (HURST, HALEY)
October 25, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP., Corporate Parent Travelers Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., for THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HURST, HALEY) Modified on 10/25/2024 to correct corporate parent information to match document. (sh)
October 25, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY for THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. (HURST, HALEY) Modified on 10/25/2024 to remove incorrect parent. (sh)
October 25, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney GEMMA L. SALUTA on behalf of Defendants THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (SALUTA, GEMMA)
October 25, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Cabarrus County Superior Court, 24CVS003394-120, against AMY CANOY, HERMAN CANOY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3946113.), filed by THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Notice of Removal)(HURST, HALEY) Modified on 10/25/2024 to add State Court information. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANOY et al v. THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERMAN CANOY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY CANOY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: HALEY KRISTINE HURST
Represented By: GEMMA L. SALUTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: HALEY KRISTINE HURST
Represented By: GEMMA L. SALUTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?