District 9 Brewing Company
Debtor: District 9 Brewing Company, LLC and District 9 Brewing Company
Us Trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Trustee: Hillary Crabtree and David Schilli
Interested Party: Starr Hill Brewery, LLC, Margaret Van de Ree, David Conklin, Andrew Durstewitz and John Ashcraft
Case Number: 3:2024bk30289
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Craig Whitley
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Filing 76 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/21/2024 10:04:09 AM ].
May 22, 2024 Filing 75 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/21/2024 09:48:06 AM ].
May 22, 2024 Filing 74 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/21/2024 09:43:18 AM ].
May 21, 2024 Filing 73 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR(S) SWORN 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/4/2024 at 02:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
May 21, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: SATISFIED (RE: related document(s)#6 Status Conference (SubchV)). (gav)
May 21, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED AS AMENDED; CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 4) (RE: related document(s)#11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #36 Use Cash Cash Collateral). Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (gav)
May 16, 2024 Filing 72 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#71 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 14, 2024 Filing 71 Application for Compensation to: Essex Richards, P.A. as attorney for Debtor, Fee:$25,580.50, Expenses:$1,836.42. If a response or objection is filed - DUE: May 28, 2024, a hearing will be held on DATE: 6/4/2024, TIME: 9:30 AM, LOCATION: Charlotte CR #2B filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 13, 2024 Filing 70 Notice of Opportunity for Hearing. If a response or objection is filed DUE:5/31/24 a hearing will be held on DATE:6/4/24, TIME: 9:30 am, LOCATION: Charlotte (RE: related document(s)#69 Motion (Other) filed by Creditor Bristol Two Time Brewery and Taproom, LLC) filed by B. Chad Ewing on behalf of Bristol Two Time Brewery and Taproom, LLC. (Ewing, B.)
May 13, 2024 Filing 69 Motion for Order Determining that Brewing Services Agreement is not Property of the Debtor or The Estate, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Terminate Brewing Services Agreement, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel the Debtor to Reject the Brewing Services Agreement Immediately. If a response or objection is filed - DUE: 5/31/24, a hearing will be held on DATE: 6/4/2024, TIME: 9:30 am, LOCATION: Charlotte. filed by B. Chad Ewing on behalf of Bristol Two Time Brewery and Taproom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Ewing, B.)
May 8, 2024 Filing 68 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/07/2024 10:13:27 AM ].
May 8, 2024 Filing 67 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/07/2024 09:45:02 AM ].
May 8, 2024 Filing 66 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/07/2024 09:32:30 AM ].
May 7, 2024 Filing 65 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors, #6 Status Conference (SubchV), #64 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 7, 2024 Filing 64 Pre-Status Conference Report (RE: related document(s)#6 Status Conference (SubchV)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 7, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: RESOLVED (RE: related document(s)#31 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Creditor KDH Ventures, LLC, Application for Administrative Expenses, Motion for Relief from Stay, Motion (Other)). (cas)
May 6, 2024 Filing 63 Response Subchapter V Trustee's Response to Motion of KDB Ventures, LLC (1) To Compel (A) Immediate Rejection of Lease Agreement, and (B) Immediate Payment of Administrative Expenses in Full Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 9:30 AM at 3-JCW-Charlotte Courtroom (RE: related document(s)#31 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Creditor KDH Ventures, LLC, Application for Administrative Expenses, Motion for Relief from Stay, Motion (Other)) Filed by David Schilli on behalf of David Schilli. (Schilli, David)
May 6, 2024 Filing 62 Response To Motion Of KDH Ventures, LLC Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 9:30 AM at 3-JCW-Charlotte Courtroom (RE: related document(s)#31 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Creditor KDH Ventures, LLC, Application for Administrative Expenses, Motion for Relief from Stay, Motion (Other)) Filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 5, 2024 Filing 61 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#58 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/05/2024. (Admin.)
May 4, 2024 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#55 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2024. (Admin.)
May 3, 2024 Filing 59 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#54 Order on Motion (Other), #55 Order (other), #56 Order on Application to Employ, #58 Order (other)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
May 3, 2024 Filing 58 Consent Order Confirming Termination of Trademark License Agreement with New Sarum Brewing Co, LLC (cch)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Essex Richards, P.A. as Bankruptcy Counsel (Related Doc #52) (cch)
May 2, 2024 Filing 55 Second Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to Utilize Cash Collateral. The authority granted under this order shall expire at noon on May 21, 2024, unless extended by the Court or by the agreement of the parties and a continued hearing on the Motion shall be held on May 21, 2024 9:30 A.M. (EST)at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 401 West Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 in Courtroom 2B. (RE: related document(s)#6, #11 Status Conference (SubchV)(cch)
May 1, 2024 Filing 54 Final Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing (Related Doc #10) (cch)
April 29, 2024 Filing 52 Ex Parte Application w/Affidavit to Employ Attorney John C. Woodman filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 25, 2024 Filing 51 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#45 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
April 25, 2024 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by B. Chad Ewing on behalf of Bristol Two Time Brewery and Taproom, LLC. (Ewing, B.)
April 25, 2024 Filing 49 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#44 Order on Motion (Other), #45 Order (other)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 24, 2024 Filing 48 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/23/2024 10:15:01 AM ].
April 24, 2024 Filing 47 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/23/2024 09:44:47 AM ].
April 23, 2024 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Stacy C. Cordes on behalf of David Conklin, Andrew Durstewitz, John Ashcraft. (Cordes, Stacy)
April 23, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #44 Order on Motion (Other)). (ea)
April 23, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 1) (RE: related document(s)#31 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Creditor KDH Ventures, LLC, Application for Administrative Expenses, Motion for Relief from Stay, Motion (Other)). Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (ea)
April 23, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED IN THE INTERIM, CONTINUED TO 5/21/24 (Number of Times Continued: 2) (RE: related document(s)#11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #36 Use Cash Cash Collateral). Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (ea)
April 22, 2024 Filing 45 Consent Order to Reschedule 341 Meeting of Creditors. It is Therefore Ordered that the 341 Meeting of Creditors in this case is continued from May 1, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. to May 8, 2024 at 1:00 p.m., and to be conducted according to the protocols of the Bankruptcy Administrators office, including Zoom attendance. (cch)
April 22, 2024 Filing 44 Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to obtain Post-Petition Financing. Linda Knights extension of credit to the Debtor pursuant to the terms of the Note shall have the protections described in 364(e) of the Bankruptcy Code; and that a continued hearing on the Motion shall be held on April 23, 2024 9:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 401 West Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 in Courtroom 2B. (Related Doc #40, #10) (cch)
April 22, 2024 Filing 42 Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, 106/206 Summary, Schedule H, Schedule G, Schedule E/F, Schedule D, Schedule A/B (RE: related document(s)#30 Order on Motion to Extend) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 22, 2024 Filing 41 Attorney Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s)#30 Order on Motion to Extend) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing. Linda Knights extension of credit to the Debtor pursuant to the terms of the Note shall have the protections described in 364(e) of the Bankruptcy Code; and that a continued hearing on the Motion shall be held on April 23, 2024 9:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 401 West Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 in Courtroom 2B.(Related Doc #10) (cch)
April 22, 2024 Filing 39 Exhibit(s) Promissory Note (RE: related document(s)#37 Other Document filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 18, 2024 Filing 38 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#33 Order on Motion (Other), #34 Order on Motion (Other), #35 Order on Motion (Other), #36 Use Cash Cash Collateral) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 16, 2024 Filing 37 Notice of Change in DIP Lender filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 15, 2024 Filing 36 Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to Utilize Cash Collateral. The authority granted under this order shall expire at noon on April 23, 2024, unless extended by the Court or by the agreement of the parties that a continuedhearing on the Motion shall be held on April 23, 2024 9:30 A.M.at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 401 West Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 in Courtroom 2B. (Related Doc #11) (cch) (Judgment Book)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System, and (II) Authorizing Continued use of Existing Business Forms (Related Doc #8) (cch)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Wages (Related Doc #7) (cch)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Approving Motion on Assurance to Utility Companies (Related Doc #9) (cch)
April 11, 2024 Filing 32 Response (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) Filed by Michael Leon Martinez on behalf of Margaret Van de Ree. (Martinez, Michael)
April 11, 2024 Filing 31 Motion to Reject Lease Agreement for Nonresidential Real Property with Notice of Hearing., in addition to Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses to KDH Ventures, LLC, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay with Notice of Hearing (Fee Amount $ 199) - PROPERTY DESCRIPTION: 2702 Heart Drive, Claremont, Catawba County, North Carolina and any personal property remaining therein., in addition to Motionfor other related relief, including adequate protection as appropriate. filed by Jimmy R. Summerlin Jr. on behalf of KDH Ventures, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B.Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B.Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B.Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Summerlin, Jimmy)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to file Missing Schedules and Statements by April 22, 2024. (Related Doc #29) Schedule A/B due 4/22/2024. Schedule D due 4/22/2024.Schedule E/F due4/22/2024. Schedule G due 4/22/2024. Schedule H due 4/22/2024. 106/206: Summary of schedules/Statistical Summary due 4/22/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/22/2024. Declaration due 4/22/2024 Atty Disclosure Statement due 4/22/2024. (cch)
April 11, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(# 24-30289) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt number A9768280, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 10, 2024 Filing 29 Motion to Extend Time to file Missing Schedules and Statements. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 10, 2024 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Jimmy R. Summerlin Jr. on behalf of KDH Ventures, LLC. (Summerlin, Jimmy)
April 8, 2024 Filing 27 Declaration Of David M. Schilli In Connection With Appointment As Subchapter V Trustee (RE: related document(s) BA Appoint Trustee) filed by David Schilli on behalf of David Schilli. (Schilli, David)
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/04/2024 10:57:21 AM ].
April 5, 2024 Filing 25 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/04/2024 09:33:30 AM ].
April 4, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#16 Order Appointing Substitute/Alternate Trustee). No. of Notices: 29. Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.)
April 4, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion OF DEBTOR FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-PETITION PAYROLL, PAYROLL TAXES, EMPLOYEE BENEFITS AND OTHER RELATED EXPENSES filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #8 Motion OF THE DEBTOR FOR ENTRY OF ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND (II) AUTHORIZING CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #9 Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER CONCERNING DEBTORS PROPOSED ADEQUATE ASSURANCE PROCEDURE AND PAYMENT TO DEBTORS RESPECTIVE UTILITY COMPANIES PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 362 AND 366 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #10 Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO OBTAIN POST-PETITION FINANCING. filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company). (jlb)
April 3, 2024 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#2 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Status Conference (SubchV)). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#3 Notice of Deficient/Defective Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #8 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #9 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #10 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #13 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 3, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Jennifer B. Lyday on behalf of New Sarum Brewing Co. LLC. (Lyday, Jennifer)
April 2, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Kelly C. Hanley on behalf of Starr Hill Brewery, LLC. (Hanley, Kelly)
April 2, 2024 Filing 16 Court Order Appointing Substitute/Alternate Trustee. (cch)
April 2, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by William L. Esser IV on behalf of SouthState Bank, National Association. (Esser, William)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice (Related Doc #12) (cch)
April 2, 2024 Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice of Appointment of Trustee: David Schilli. (Abel, Shelley)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #8 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #9 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #10 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #12 Motion to Shorten Notice filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 Motion to Shorten Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #8 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #9 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #10 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company, #11 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral EMERGENCY MOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR AUTHORITY TO USE CASH COLLATERAL filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 MotionMOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO OBTAIN POST-PETITION FINANCING. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 MotionMOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER CONCERNING DEBTORS PROPOSED ADEQUATE ASSURANCE PROCEDURE AND PAYMENT TO DEBTORS RESPECTIVE UTILITY COMPANIES PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 362 AND 366 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 MotionMOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR ENTRY OF ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND (II) AUTHORIZING CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Filing 7 MotionMOTION OF DEBTOR FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-PETITION PAYROLL, PAYROLL TAXES, EMPLOYEE BENEFITS AND OTHER RELATED EXPENSES. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B.Pre-Status Report Due By 5/7/2024. (cch)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#2 Order (other)) filed by U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office. (Scholz, BA)
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 6/7/2024. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/1/2024. (cch)
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 Court Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company). (cch)
April 1, 2024 Filing 2 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Operating Order. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor District 9 Brewing Company) (cch)
April 1, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11(# 24-30289) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A9758454, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 1, 2024 Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice of Appointment of Trustee: Hillary Crabtree. (Abel, Shelley)
April 1, 2024 Trustee's Rejection of Appointment (Crabtree, Hillary)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Subchapter V - Filing Fee Amount $ 1738 (Woodman, John)

Search for this case: District 9 Brewing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: District 9 Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By: John C. Woodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: District 9 Brewing Company
Represented By: John C. Woodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Hillary Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: David Schilli
Represented By: David Schilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Starr Hill Brewery, LLC
Represented By: Kelly C. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Margaret Van de Ree
Represented By: Michael Leon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Conklin
Represented By: Stacy C. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Andrew Durstewitz
Represented By: Stacy C. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Ashcraft
Represented By: Stacy C. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?