Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC
Debtor: Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC
Trustee: James David Nave
Us Trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Interested Party: Anthony L. Poole
Case Number: 4:2024bk40057
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Craig Whitley
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 48 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#47 Order on Application for Compensation) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order Granting Application for Compensation to Moon Wright & Houston PLLC, Counsel for the Debtor - Fees: $10,537.50 and Expenses $2,458.94 for April 2, 2024 through April 30, 2024. (Related Doc #39) (mdw)
May 24, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: SATISFIED (RE: related document(s)#5 Status Conference (SubchV)). (cet)
May 24, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED ON INTERIM BASIS THROUGH JUNE (RE: related document(s)#10 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC). (cet)
May 22, 2024 Filing 46 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#45 Monthly Status/Operating Report filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
May 21, 2024 Filing 45 Monthly Status/Operating Report for the Month of April 2024 filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
May 20, 2024 Filing 44 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors HELD - DEBTOR(S) SWORN (RE: related document(s)#4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors) (Scholz, BA)
May 15, 2024 Filing 43 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#41 Use Cash Cash Collateral) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
May 9, 2024 Filing 42 Pre-Status Conference Report (RE: related document(s)#5 Status Conference (SubchV)) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
May 9, 2024 Filing 41 Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Hearing set for 5/24/24 at 10:30 am in Shelby, NC (Related Doc #10) (bfm)
May 8, 2024 Filing 40 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#35 Order on Motion (Other), #36 Order on Motion (Other), #37 Order on Motion to Assume/Reject, #38 Order on Motion (Other)) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
May 8, 2024 Filing 39 Application for Compensation to:Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC, Fee:$12,657.50, Expenses:$2,458.94. If a response or objection is filed - DUE: 5/22/2024, a hearing will be held on DATE: 5/24/2024, TIME: 10:30 am, LOCATION: Shelby filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Notice of Opportunity for Hearing #3 Certificate of Service) (Wright, Richard)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Benefits and Other Related Expenses (Related Doc #14) (bfm)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Granting Motion to Assume/Reject (Related Doc #13) (bfm)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order Providing for Adequate Assurance to Utility Companies. (Related Doc #12) (bfm)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System, (II) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, and (III) Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc #11) (bfm)
April 27, 2024 Filing 33 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/26/2024 10:49:19 AM ].
April 27, 2024 Filing 32 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/26/2024 10:12:21 AM ].
April 26, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: (RE: related document(s)#11 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC - GRANTED, #12 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC - GRANTED, #13 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC - GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC, #14 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) - GRANTED. (cas)
April 26, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED ON INTERIM BASIS, CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 1) (RE: related document(s)#10 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (cas)
April 25, 2024 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Zachary H. Smith on behalf of The Keith Corporation. (Smith, Zachary)
April 17, 2024 Filing 30 Request for Notice (Sharma, Amitkumar)
April 16, 2024 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Sara W. Higgins on behalf of Jae Ok Shim. (Higgins, Sara)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #26) (bfm)
April 12, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#23 Order on Motion (Other)) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 12, 2024 Filing 26 Ex Parte Application w/Affidavit to Employ Attorney Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Wright) (Wright, Richard)
April 12, 2024 Filing 25 Debtor's Financial Disclosures Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1116(1) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 12, 2024 Filing 24 Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Lift Debit Restraint (Related Doc #22) (bfm)
April 12, 2024 Filing 22 Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Lift Debit Restraint. filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Status Conference (SubchV)). No. of Notices: 30. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.)
April 11, 2024 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 31. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.)
April 11, 2024 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Matthew L Tomsic on behalf of Northcross II. LLC. (Tomsic, Matthew)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice (Related Doc #17) (bfm)
April 11, 2024 Filing 17 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Notice (RE: related document(s)#10 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #11 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #12 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #13 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #14 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#10 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #11 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #12 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #13 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #14 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #15 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)#10 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #11 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #12 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #13 Motion to Assume/Reject filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC, #14 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 14 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Benefits and Other Related Expenses. filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to Reject Unexpired Nonresidential Real Estate Leases with Notice of Hearing. filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 Motion for Entry of Order Providing for Adequate Assurance to Utility Companies. filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System, (II) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, and (III) Granting Related Relief. filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Wright, Richard)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Richard S. Wright on behalf of Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Wright, Richard)
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Cole Hayes on behalf of Anthony L. Poole. (Hayes, Cole)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#6 Order (other)) filed by U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office. (Scholz, BA)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 Clerk's Entry to Denote Correction to Docket. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Please disregard, docketed in error. (RE: related document(s)#2 Notice of Deficient/Defective Filing). (cch)
April 9, 2024 Filing 6 Subchapter V Operating Order. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC) (bfm)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 5/24/2024 at 10:30 AM at 4-Cleveland County Courthse.Pre-Status Report Due By 5/10/2024. (cch)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 1:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 6/17/2024. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/15/2024. (cch)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 6/17/2024. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/29/2024. (cch) Modified on 4/9/2024 (cch). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Please disregard, docketed in error. See document #4. Form was not generated.
April 9, 2024 Filing 2 Court Notice of Defective Filing (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC). Corrected Document due by 4/16/2024. (cch) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Please disregard, docketed in error.
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Subchapter V - Filing Fee Amount $ 1738 (Wright, Richard) Modified on 4/9/2024 (cch).
April 8, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11(# 24-40057) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A9764685, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 8, 2024 Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice of Appointment of Trustee: James David Nave. (Abel, Shelley)

Search for this case: Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Carolina Sleep Shoppe, LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Wright
Represented By: Moon Wright and Houston, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: James David Nave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anthony L. Poole
Represented By: Cole Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?