Hampton v. Walmart Dc 6070 et al
Plaintiff: Donnell M. Hampton
Defendant: Walmart Dc 6070, Walmart Stores, Inc., Jerry Pendelton, Bob Apple, Walter Mooneyham and Ron LNU
Case Number: 1:2009cv00327
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/10/2010. Signed by Deputy Clerk on behalf of Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 3/10/10. (ejb)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ROSEBORO ORDER: Pltf respond to Defts 19 MOTION to Dismiss notlater than 3/8/10 - Set/Reset Deadlines (Responses due by 3/8/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/17/10. (ejb)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER 14 Memorandum and Recommendations adopted. Defts Walmart DC6070, Walmart Stores, Inc., Jerry Pendleton, and Bob Apples 12 SpecialAppearance Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service and/or to Quash Service GRANTED, and these Defts are dismissed from action; Defts Walter Mooneyham,General Manager Ron LNU and Ron LNU are dismissed from action for reasons stated in 12 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service and/or to Quash Service and the 14 M&R. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. substituted as proper party deft and caption of case amended to reflect as such. Clerk of Court shall issue summons to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and US Marshal shall serve summons and complaint on Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. through service on its registered agent, CT Corporation System, 225 Hillsborough Street, Raleigh, N.C. 27603. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/6/10. (ejb)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Jerry Pendelton, Walmart Dc 6070, Walmart Stores, Inc., Bob Apple Objections to M&R due by 12/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/30/09. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Walmart Dc 6070 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Dc 6070
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Pendelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Mooneyham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?