Wiley v. Buncombe County et al
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Wiley
Defendant: Buncombe County, Van Duncan and K. Hanse
Case Number: 1:2010cv00181
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 03/02/2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Relief; denying 44 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/19/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER and NOTICE denying 23 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; dismissing 29 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing 34 Motion for Summary Judgment as premature. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order to file his response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 20 and 21). Plaintiffs failure to respond may result in the Courts granting a judgment for Defendants, that is, in the dismissal of Plaintiffs Complaint without any further notice to him.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 08/02/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw) Modified text on 8/2/2011 (emw).
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 1 Complaint: Clerk shall prepare process for Defts & deliver it to US Marshal to serve process upon Defts, and Defts shall file responses to Pltfs allegations in accordance w/FRCvP. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/8/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Discovery; denying 11 12 14 Motion for Entry of Default; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/28/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Buncombe County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buncombe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Hanse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?