National Alliance for Accessibility, Inc. et al v. Bhuna Corporation
Plaintiff: National Alliance for Accessibility, Inc. and Denise Payne
Defendant: Bhuna Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00079
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/10/2012. (thh)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order of Dismissal dated December 30, 2011. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 12/30/2011. (ejb)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lawrence A. Fuller for National Alliance for Accessibility, Inc.,Lawrence A. Fuller for Denise Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/21/2011. (pdf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Alliance for Accessibility, Inc. et al v. Bhuna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Alliance for Accessibility, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Decker Lane
Represented By: Lawrence A. Fuller
Represented By: Laura L. Noble
Represented By: Nicholas J Sanservino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Payne
Represented By: Lawrence A. Fuller
Represented By: Christopher Decker Lane
Represented By: Laura L. Noble
Represented By: Nicholas J Sanservino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhuna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?