Synovus Bank v. Osada
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Jana M. Osada
Thirdparty_defendant: Synovus Financial Corp. d/b/a National Bank of South Carolina
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Jana M. Osada
Counter_claimant: Jana M. Osada
Counter_defendant: Synovus Bank
Case Number: 1:2011cv00115
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (ejb)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend Amended Answer to Complaint. Defendant shall file her Second Amended Answer by December 7, 2011. The Court DENIES as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss, 31 Motion to Strike and 35 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from the filing of the Second Amended Answer to answer or otherwise respond to any counterclaims or third-party claims asserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/22/2011. (thh)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Strike Answer to Complaint & 12 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/2/11. (nll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Osada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana M. Osada
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Synovus Financial Corp. d/b/a National Bank of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Jana M. Osada
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jana M. Osada
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?