America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC v. Yarborough et al
Plaintiff: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC
Defendant: Helen Christy Yarborough, Chrystal Ramseur Jarret, Ronya Fakhoury Banks and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Thomas Rest Care Facilities, Inc., C & P Family Care Homes, LLC and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Cross_claimant: Chrystal Ramseur Jarret and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Cross_defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Asheville Check Cashing Company, Helen Christy Yarborough, Chrystal Ramseur Jarret and Ronya Fakhoury Banks
Thirdparty_defendant: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC and Asheville Check Cashing Company
Counter_claimant: Ronya Fakhoury Banks and Chrystal Ramseur Jarret
Counter_defendant: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00248
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting 22 Motion and 25 Amended and Restated Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Pltf and against Deft. (ejb)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Pltf shall supplement its 22 Motion for Default Judgment as to Helen Christy Yarborough with an affidavit showing the amount due, within 14 days of entry of this Order; 22 Motion for Default Judgment held in abeyance until Pltf's required affidavit is filed; and Pltf to submit Proposed Judgment through CyberClerk for Clerk's signature. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/1/12. (ejb)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal as to all settled claims within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order re 19 Report of Mediation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/24/2012. (thh)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/25/2012. (thh)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Status Conference set for 1/27/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell; Motion Hearing re 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney set for same time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/13/12. ***See Order for further instructions*** (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC v. Yarborough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Karolyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Christy Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrystal Ramseur Jarret
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronya Fakhoury Banks
Represented By: Ronald C. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Thomas Rest Care Facilities, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: C & P Family Care Homes, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chrystal Ramseur Jarret
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Asheville Check Cashing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Helen Christy Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chrystal Ramseur Jarret
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ronya Fakhoury Banks
Represented By: Ronald C. True
Represented By: Ronald C. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Asheville Check Cashing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ronya Fakhoury Banks
Represented By: Ronald C. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chrystal Ramseur Jarret
Represented By: Christopher B. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: America's Living Centers-WNC, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Karolyi
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Karolyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?