LW Construction of Charleston, LLC v. Southern Mechanical of the Carolinas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LW Construction of Charleston, LLC
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company, Southern Mechanical of the Carolinas, Inc. and Chad Cooke
Receiver: Richard Seibert
Case Number: 1:2012cv00086
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/30/13. (nll)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER accepting 33 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; Counts Three and Five of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/25/13. (nll)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Stay; denying 13 Motion to Stay. The parties are Ordered and directed to confer and file a Certification of Initial Attorney's Conference as provided by LCvR 16.1 on or before February 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/4/13. (nll)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/13/12. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LW Construction of Charleston, LLC v. Southern Mechanical of the Carolinas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Elliot Bayzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Mechanical of the Carolinas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Richard Seibert
Represented By: Anna S. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LW Construction of Charleston, LLC
Represented By: W. James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?