Newman v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Steven J. Newman
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2012cv00167
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/28/2014. (khm)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/12/13. (nll)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 04/15/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (thh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Newman
Represented By: Leah Michelle Broker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?