Barnes v. Astrue

Plaintiff: John Barnes
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2012cv00353
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jonathan Mark Bruce for John Barnes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/30/2015. (nv)
March 12, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/12/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.(nll)
February 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before fifteen (15) days from entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file response as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/4/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barnes
Represented By: Mark A. Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Christian Vainieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?