Galloway v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Randall Galloway
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00149
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/14/14. (ejb)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Amended Order dated 1/16/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration under sentence 4 of 405(g); reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding the case for further administrative proceedings. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/10/14. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Galloway
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?