AIX Specialty Insurance Company v. Bird Brain, Inc. et al

Defendant: Sandra Pressley, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Bird Brain, Inc., Susie W. Gibson and Dean Pressley
Plaintiff: AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00242
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for Pltf shall respond in writing on or before 2/24/2014 as to reasons why Pltf has not filed a motion for entry of default entry of default, or file a motion for entry of default, on the part of Defts Bird Brain, Inc. and Susie W. Gibson a/k/a Vivian Y. Gibson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/16/14. (ejb)
September 26, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/26/14. (khm)
November 5, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(khm)
September 27, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Patrick D. Crandell for AIX Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/26/2013. (thh)
September 27, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Timothy F. Casey for AIX Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/26/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIX Specialty Insurance Company v. Bird Brain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Bryan Gregory Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Brain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie W. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Andrew Bulfer
Represented By: Patrick D. Crandell
Represented By: Timothy F. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.