Parker v. Community Carepartners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Megan Parker
Defendant: Community Carepartners, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00006
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/10/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (kby)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file Answer within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/20/2016. (nvc)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 Government's JOINT NOTICE. The Complaint be unsealed and served upon the defendant by the relator; all other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal and not be made public or ser ved upon the defendant, except for this Order and the Government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which the relator will serve upon the defendant only after service of the Complaint; the seal is LIFTED as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. See order for further details . Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/6/2016. (nvc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Community Carepartners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Parker
Represented By: Margaret (Meg) Behringer Maloney
Represented By: Audrey Clair Page
Represented By: Christopher Robert Strianese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Carepartners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?