Blakley v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: |
Demarcus Blakley |
Defendant: |
Correctional Officer Bates, Correctional Officer Boyer, Richard Terry and Supervisor John Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00165 |
Filed: |
July 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
Buncombe |
Presiding Judge: |
Dennis Howell |
Presiding Judge: |
Martin Reidinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
113
JUDGMENT in favor of Correctional Officer Bates, Correctional Officer Boyer against Demarcus Blakley. ORDER that the Plaintiff shall recover nothing from the Defendants in the form of damages. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety, and the Defendants shall recover their costs of the action from the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/13/2017. (khm)
|
November 23, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for further details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/23/2016. (nvc)
|
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
71
SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan re 42 Amended Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/22/16. (emw)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
66
ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time 65 is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall have through and including August 26, 2016, within which to file a Response to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/19/16. (emw)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
61
ORDER denying 50 Motion to Seal Document Affidavits of Michael Grastly and Richard Terry. If Defendants intend to continue to rely on these Affidavits and the exhibits in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment, the Defendants shall file an unsealed version of such affidavits and exhibits on the public docket within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/5/16. (ssh)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying Deft's 55 Motion to File Over-Length Brief. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/1/16. (ejb)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
17
ORDER discharging the 12 Show Cause Order; granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 16 Amended Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery and to Extend Time to Identify and Serve Deft John Doe; parties to conduct an in itial attorneys' conference (IAC) within 14 days of this Order and submit a certificate of IAC to the Court within 7 days thereafter; discovery not to be limited to identity of the John Doe Deft; and Pltf has an additional 120 days from the entry of this Order to identify and effectuate service upon the Deft Supervisor John Doe. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/14/14. (ejb)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 14 Plaintiff's Show Cause Response/Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery and to Extend Time to Identify and Serve Defendant John Doe. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/13/14. (khm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?