Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Charles H. Taylor and Dwayne H. Wiseman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00264
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings until November 20, 2015, to allow the parties to finalize the settlement of this matter and to file a joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/18/2015. (nv)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Entry of Proposed Protocol Regarding Electronically Stored Information. The Court INCORPORATES the terms of [22-1] Joint Proposed Protocol Regarding Electronically Stored Information into the body of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/2/2015. (khm)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Christopher D. Kiesel for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Represented By: Susannah M DeNicola
Represented By: Kyle M. Keegan
Represented By: Christopher D. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne H. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?