Bratton v. The US Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: George Andrew Bratton
Defendant: US Department of Justice, Eric Holder, Anne M. Tompkins, The Disability Rights North Carolina Organization and John/Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2015cv00037
Filed: February 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: McDowell
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 7 "Notice of New Evidence and Removal or Transfer of Pending Case to the Eastern District Court of North Carolina." Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/17/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/8/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nv)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Pltf. shall have 30 days from entry of this Order within which to obtain counsel. Upon entry of an appearance by counsel, Court will allow counsel 21 days to file an amended complaint that sets forth any non-frivolo us claims arising from death of Pltf's daughter. FURTHER ORDERED that Pltf's 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis and 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction shall be HELD IN ABEYANCE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/2/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. The US Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Andrew Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Disability Rights North Carolina Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?