Plaintiff v. State of North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Todd W. Plaintiff
Defendant: State of North Carolina, County of Buncombe, NC, Richard Schumacher, Robert H. Christy, Jr., Edwin D. Clontz, Steven D. Cogburn, Tammy C. Case, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Blue Ridge Mental Health Area Developmental Disabilities & Substance Abuse Services, Western Highlands Network Area Authority, Lawrence E. Thompson, III, Cynthia L. Alleman, Philip M. Hannah, Robyn Morris, William E. Loose, Matney & Associates, P.A., David E. Matney, III, Jennifer B. Formichella, John L. Bramlett, Gum, Hillier & McCroskey, P.A., David R. Hillier, Surety Agency, LLC, Karen K. Beard, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Thomas Bowes, SB Services, LLC, Blair Clark, Sandra Layton, Marianne E. Redmond, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Cheryl Dommer, ACE American Insurance Company, Vivian M. Nijib, Martineau & King, PLLC, Elizabeth A. Martineau, Guiselle F. Mahon, Roberts & Stevens, P.A., F. Lachicotte Zemp, Jr., Carter & Kropelniciki, P.A., Steven Kropelnicki, Jr., Great American Insurance Company and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2015cv00044
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 02/22/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying Pltf's 296 Motion to Strike the Exhibits attached to Defts Stephen Kropelnicki and Carter and Kropelnicki, P.A.s 295 Reply to Objection to Memorandum and Recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/18/16. (ejb)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER: ORDER staying all further proceedings in this action, including all discovery, pending the District Judge's ruling on this Memorandum and Recomme ndation and Order; granting Pltf's 247 "MOTION for Leave to File Supplement...to His Omnibus Memorandum..."; and denying Pltf's 165 MOTION to Strike Deft Lawrence E. Thompson, III's Motion to Dismiss ". RECOMMENDATIONS to the District Judge that the following Motions be GRANTED: 125 , 127 , 147 , 150 , 160 , 176 , 177 , 183 , 199 , 206 , 211 , 218 , 220 , 224 , 228 , 230 , 232 , 234 , and 236 MOTIONS to Dismiss; and further recommends that the 21 Amended Complaint be DISMISSED, that is, Pltf's Americans with Disabilities Act claim be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, that his self representation claim be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, and that the Court DECLINE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION of any remaining state law claims. ( Objections to M&R due by 1/29/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/12/16. (ejb) Modified on 1/12/2016 (ejb).
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER denying Pltf's 276 MOTION for Disqualification of the Honorable David S. Cayer and Recusal of the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/11/16. (ejb)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 239 Motion to Stay and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 125 MOTION to Dismiss, 127 MOTION to Dismiss, 147 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) re 81 Summons Returned Unexecuted, 150 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(m), 160 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Steven Kropelnicki and Carter & Kropelnicki, P.A., 176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complain t, 177 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 183 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 199 MOTION to Dismiss, 206 MOTION to Dismiss, 211 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To 12(b)(6), 218 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike, 220 MOTION to Dismiss, 224 MOTION to Dismiss, 228 MOTION to Dismiss, 230 MOTION to Dismiss, 232 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 234 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 236 MOTION to Dismiss for L ack of Jurisdiction, 167 MOTION to Strike, and 215 MOTION for Sanctions, ( Pltf's Responses to these pending motions due by 12/3/2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/2/15. (Pro se litigants Lawrence E. Thompson, III, Robyn S. Morris & Todd W. Short served by US Mail.)(ejb)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 208 Motion to Substitute Party. United States of America substituted for Defendant John Bramlett. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/29/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER, denying MOTIONS 83 , 84 , 111 , 113 , 131 , 146 , 149 , 174 , 190 , 191 , 201 . See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/18/2015. (nv)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 140 , 141 & 142 MOTIONS for Extension of Time to Answer re: 21 Amended Complaint. Arthur Carder answer due 10/6/2015; Smoky Mountain Center answer due 10/8/2015; Martineau & King, PLLC answer due 10/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/28/15. (ejb)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Defts Marianne E. Redmond and Sandra Layton's 53 "Motion for clarification..." is GRANTED to extent the Verified Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading before the Court and Pltf shall have until 8/20/2015 to serve the Verified Amended Complaint on Defts; Pltf's 57 Response to Motion for Clarification, Motion for Order Vacating Alleged Service of Process, inter alia", and 58 "Motion to Agree to Extension of Time to Respond and Motion to Withdraw Service of Process on Defts Layton and Redmond, as to the Original Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT; Pltf's 59 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process is GRANTED, and Pltf shall have up to and including 8/20/2015 to serve Defts with the Verified Amended Complaint; and Pltf's 62 "Motion to Stay Proceedings" is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/14/15. (ejb) Modified on 7/14/2015 to correct typos (ejb).
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying as moot 45 & 49 Motions for Dismissal and Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Surety Agency, LLC, Thomas Bowes, and Karen Beard. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/10/15. (ejb)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Pltf's 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Due to Medical Reasons, and Pltf' shall file his Second Amended Complaint on or before 6/4/2015; denying as moot Pltf's 42 Motion for Dismissal and Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Robyn S. Morris. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/1/15. (ejb)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Notify Joinder of Parties; denying as moot 36 Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to Respond to Motion to Plaintiff's Motion to Notify Joinder of Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/28/15. (ejb)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Pltf's 24 Motion to Lift Stay or Issue Ruling, and the stay of this matter is hereby LIFTED; Pltf shall proceed with service on the named Defts; and denying as moot Pltf's 27 Motion and Notice of Constitutional Question. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/6/15. (ejb)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Electronic Notification via ( tws@toddwshort.com ). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/17/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail and electronically.) (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. State of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd W. Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Buncombe, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Christy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin D. Clontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy C. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Mental Health Area Developmental Disabilities & Substance Abuse Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Highlands Network Area Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip M. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matney & Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Matney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer B. Formichella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Bramlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gum, Hillier & McCroskey, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Hillier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen K. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne E. Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Dommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian M. Nijib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martineau & King, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guiselle F. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts & Stevens, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Lachicotte Zemp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter & Kropelniciki, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kropelnicki, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?