Brigham et al v. Patla, Straus, Robinson & Moore, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Dana P. Brigham and Patricia M. Brigham |
Defendant: |
Patla, Straus, Robinson & Moore, P.A., Steven I. Goldstein and Robert A. Freeman, III |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00069 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Asheville Office |
County: |
XX, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Dennis Howell |
Presiding Judge: |
Martin Reidinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
73
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/23/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
|
April 10, 2015 |
Filing
48
ORDER Defts Robert A. Freeman, III, Steven I. Goldstein and Patla, Straus, Robinson & Moore, P.A. answer(s) to Amended Complaint due 5/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/10/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brigham et al v. Patla, Straus, Robinson & Moore, P.A. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dana P. Brigham |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Patricia M. Brigham |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Patla, Straus, Robinson & Moore, P.A. |
Represented By: |
E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III |
Represented By: |
Cynthia L Van Horne |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Steven I. Goldstein |
Represented By: |
E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III |
Represented By: |
Cynthia L Van Horne |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Robert A. Freeman, III |
Represented By: |
E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III |
Represented By: |
Cynthia L Van Horne |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?