Crespo et al v. Christina Trust et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Crespo and Carey A Crespo
Defendant: Christina Trust, OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00043
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/8/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 3/8/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER affirming in part 24 Memorandum and Recommendation, and granting Pltf's Response, deemed to be a 19 voluntary Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing Christina Trust without prejudice; overruling at this time, further Recommendation of dismissal without prejudice as to Defts Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; however, quashing the prior service of the corporate Defts; enlarging time up to and inclusive of 4/28/2017 for serving previously issued summons(es) and a copy of Amended Complaint as to Defts Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; and Pltfs shall have up to inclusive of 5/10/2017, to file Proof of Service with the Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 3/29/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Pltfs' 21 Motion for Entry of Default of Defendants OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/9/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 10 MOTION for Entry of Default. The Court directs the parties to Show Cause in writing by 1/20/2017, whether the Court should recommend to the District Court that it dismiss this case for failure to perfect service. See order for further details . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/3/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend their Complaint and an extension of time to perfect service of process on Defendants. The Court directs Plaintiffs that they shall have ten (10) days from the entry of this Ord er to amend their Complaint if they decide to do so. Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order to perfect service on Defendants. The Court denies without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crespo et al v. Christina Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey A Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?