Hill v. McCrory et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Hill
Defendant: Patrick L. McCrory, North Carolina State Board of Elections, A. Grant Whitney, Jr. and Kim W. Strach
Case Number: 1:2016cv00259
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Amend Judgment; denying 46 Request for a Three Judge Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/8/2016. (kby)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/7/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (khm)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Plaintiff may respond to the pending Renewed 35 MOTION to Dismiss on or before 10/11/2016. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/26/2016. (kby)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice the 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/13/2016. (kby)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Response; denying without prejudice the 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be allowed an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to effectuate service in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/29/2016. (kby)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 5 Order on Motion for TRO; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 12 Motion to Set Hearing and Shorten the Time for Response to the Pr eliminary Injunction Motion; denying without prejudice the 9 Motion to Provide In Camera Review of Results of 15 March 2016 Primary Election. See Order for additional instruction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/12/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice the 7 Request for Production of Important Document, to Include Motion to Shorten Time for Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/4/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. McCrory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L. McCrory
Represented By: James Bernier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: James Bernier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Grant Whitney, Jr.
Represented By: James Bernier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim W. Strach
Represented By: James Bernier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?