Hanson, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Hanson and Tony Hanson
Defendant: 3M Company, American Biltrite, Inc, Cyprus-Amax Minerals Co., Domco Products Texas, L.P, General Electric Company, H.B. Fuller Company, Mannington Mills Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Pfizer, Tile Council of North America, Warren Pumps, LLC and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00328
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting the 98 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all claims by the Plaintiffs against Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/27/2018. (kby)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The 93 Joint Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and all claims by the Plaintiffs against Defendant Domco Products Texas Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/9/2018. (maf)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 88 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all claims by the Plaintiffs against Defendant American Biltrite, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/12/2018. (kby)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Dft's 65 Motion to Dismiss; and the Pla's claims against the Dft Mannington Mills, Inc., are hereby dismissed. Plaintiff's 79 Objections are overruled; the 78 Memorandum and Recommendation is accepted. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/27/2017. (kby)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 69 Deft. Tile Council of North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss; granting 75 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all claims by the Plaintiffs against Defendant Tile Council of North America, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/3/2017. (khm)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying without prejudice the 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/31/2017. (kby)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall have 10 days from the entry of this Order to file their Amended Complaint; DENYING as moot the pending Motions to Dismiss [6, 33, & 50] Motions to Dismiss upon the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/12/2017. (thh)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Sabrina G. Stone for Lisa Hanson, as Executrix of the Estate of Delmont D. Hanson, Deceased. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/9/16. (ejb)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for H.B. Fuller Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/03/16. (emw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson, et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hanson
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hanson
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Michael Casin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite, Inc
Represented By: Eric T. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus-Amax Minerals Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, L.P
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mannington Mills Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tile Council of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?