Kotsias v. LaVie Care Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rita Kotsias
Defendant: LaVie Care Centers, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Florida Health Care Properties, LLC, Centennial Healthcare Holding Company, LLC, Emerald Ridge Healthcare, LLC, The Oaks at Sweeten Creek Healthcare, LLC, Work Comp Strategic Solutions, Inc., Kelly Ongie, ESIS, Inc., INA, ACE Group and Chubb
Case Number: 1:2016cv00339
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 04/28/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ni)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that 30 Plaintiff's Objections to the Memorandum and Recommendation are OVERRULED; the 28 Memorandum and Recommendation is ACCEPTED; and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [15, 17, 22] are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: All claims asserted by the Plaintiff against Defendants ESIS, INA, Ace Group, Work Comp Strategic Solutions, Inc., and Kelly Ongie are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's civil conspiracy claims against the Consulate Defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; as previously ordered by the Magistrate Judge 28 , the Consulate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 15 is DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to renew as to Plaintiff's ADA retaliation claims. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/29/2017. (khm)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until 3/14/2017 (plus an additional 3 days if served by mail) to respond to the pending 15 MOTION to Dismiss and 17 MOTION to Dismiss. The Clerk directs the Clerk to terminate the 19 Motion to Dismiss and correct the docket to reflect an Answer only. See Order for further information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/14/2017. (kby)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and , 11 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. All Dfts in this action shall have until 1/27/2017 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/4/2017. (kby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotsias v. LaVie Care Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Kotsias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaVie Care Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulate Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salus Rehabilitation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Health Care Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Ridge Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Oaks at Sweeten Creek Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Work Comp Strategic Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ongie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESIS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?