Curry et al v. Schletter Inc.

Plaintiff: Bryan Curry, Terran Brooks, Jermaine Willis and Brian Hopper
Defendant: Schletter Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft's 38 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, and this action is STAYED until further Order of the Court; FURTHER ORDERED parties shall file a status report with the Court every 90 days until such time as the bankruptcy matter is closed. (First Status Report due by 8/13/2018.) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/15/2018. (ejb)
March 26, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED with respect to the Plaintiffs' claim for breach of fiduciary duty, and this claim is DISMISSED. In all other respects, the Defendant's Motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/26/18. (emw)
January 31, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING the parties to brief the issue of whether Plaintiffs' negligence claim survives Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Briefs shall be no longer than ten (10) pages. Defendant's brief is due on or by February 12, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply shall be due one (1) week from when Defendant files its brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/31/18. (emw)
April 12, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John A. Yanchunis for Terran Brooks, Bryan Curry, Brian Hopper, Jermaine Willis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/12/2017. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry et al v. Schletter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Curry
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terran Brooks
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Willis
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hopper
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schletter Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?