Burrell v. Bayer Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Kristiana Tweed Burrell
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Christopher Ford Williams, Stacy D Travis and Biltmore OB-GYN, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00031
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER upon Remand from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals VACATING 41 Dismissal Order. This action is remanded to Buncombe County Superior Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/5/2019. (tmg)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/10/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 5/10/2017. (ejb)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 1:17-cv-00031 only. Member Case: 1:17-cv-00032 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 4/4/2017. (khm) Modified on 4/5/2017to change signature date from 4/5/2017 to 4/4/2017. (khm)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 03/17/17. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell v. Bayer Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristiana Tweed Burrell
Represented By: John C. Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Erixson
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Erixson
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc.
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Erixson
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Erixson
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ford Williams
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Erixson
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy D Travis
Represented By: John D. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biltmore OB-GYN, P.A.
Represented By: John D. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?