Burr v. Macon County Sheriffs Office et al

Plaintiff: Joshua L. Burr
Defendant: Macon County Sheriffs Office, Scott Marron, Justin Crane and Dale Clouse
Case Number: 1:2017cv00076
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/9/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/9/2019. (maf) Modified on 1/9/2019 to remove reference of mailing. (maf)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER that Pltf's 1 Complaint survives initial review as to all Defts except for the Macon County Sheriff's Office. Clerk shall send Pltf summons forms to fill out so service may be made on remaining Defts. Once the Court receives the summons forms, U.S. Marshal shall effectuate service on Defts in accordance with Rule 4 of F.R.Cv.P. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/14/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER that Clerk of this Court shall mail Plaintiff a new IFP application for Plaintiff to fill out. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the filing fee for this action. If, within 20 days of receiving the new IFP application, Pla intiff fails to return the application, or does not pay the filing fee, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. ( IFP Application/Fee due by 10/26/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/3/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burr v. Macon County Sheriffs Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua L. Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?