Masters v. Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leslie Masters
Defendant: Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00333
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 18 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/16/2018. (kby)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties shall file a designation of mediator by 6/4/2018. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/21/2018. (maf)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall file a report advising of the outcome of the 3/23/2018 global settlement mediation and, if such mediation did not result in a settlement of the Plaintiff's claims, identifying their selected mediator for the present action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/11/2018. (maf)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William R. Horwitz for Urban Outfitters, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/26/2018. (khm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters v. Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Masters
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?