Fairchild v. Kubota Tractor Corporation
Plaintiff: Keith Fairchild
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00069
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: McDowell
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. The jury trial, currently set for September 9, 2019, will be rescheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/12/2019. (kby)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is denied to the extent that Plaintiff's New Motor Vehicles Warranties Act (Count I) claim remains pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/23/2018. (kby)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 6 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan, directing parties to file with the Court a Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, Civil Form AO 85. The document shall be filed on or before May 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/23/2018. (kby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairchild v. Kubota Tractor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Smith Chesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Fairchild
Represented By: Walter E. Daniels, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?