Wilkie v. Homesite Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert V. Wilkie
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00213
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Burke
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Homesite Insurance Company.(Foster, Jeremy)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homesite Insurance Company (Foster, Jeremy)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. Homesite Insurance Company served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (maf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Stuart Foster on behalf of Homesite Insurance Company (Foster, Jeremy)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert V. Wilkie. Old address: 601 Dixie Avenue, NW, Valdese, NC 28690. New address: 250 Pleasantview Loop, Morganton, NC 28655. (maf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to U.S. Marshal for service as to Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachment: #1 USM-285 Form) (maf)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall prepare and submit the summons to the Clerk within 20 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/7/2018. (Pro se litigant served by U.S. Mail.) (maf)
August 7, 2018 Set Deadlines: Proposed summons due by 8/27/2018. (maf)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert V. Wilkie. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf) Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Robert V. Wilkie against Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkie v. Homesite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy Stuart Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?