United States of America v. Approximately $13,594 in Funds
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $13,594 in Funds
Case Number: 1:2018cv00226
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 20, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan Douglas Letzring on behalf of United States of America, Attorney Tiffany Mallory Moore terminated. (Letzring, Jonathan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 USMS Return of Service re: #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem. Property received into USMS custody on 4/6/2018. (maf)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest In Rem of Property. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 07/08/2018. (ejb)
August 7, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $13,594 in Funds, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/7/2018 to correct party's name whom Complaint is filed against. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $13,594 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $13,594 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?