United States of America v. $1,751.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2003 Chevrolete Silverado (VIN: 1GCHK29183E152488), $1,751.00 in United States Currency and Chevrolete Silverado 2003
Claimant: Donna Lee Watts
Case Number: 1:2018cv00232
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 20, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 US Attorney advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 10/31/2018. (khm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by United States of America (Moore, Tiffany)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan Douglas Letzring on behalf of United States of America, Attorney Tiffany Mallory Moore terminated. (Letzring, Jonathan)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/9/2018. (khm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Donna Lee Watts.(Cassady, Richard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 USMS Return of Service for Warrant for Arrest In Rem as to $1,751.00 served on USM, entered into JDIS on 9/5/18. (ejb)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property In Rem. (khm)
August 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,751.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2003 Chevrolete Silverado (VIN: 1GCHK29183E152488)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,751.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevrolete Silverado 2003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donna Lee Watts
Represented By: Richard E. Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?