Jones v. Trustees of Isothermal Community College et al
Plaintiff: Karen K. Jones
Defendant: Stephen Matheny, Kimberly Gold, Walter Dalton and Trustees of Isothermal Community College
Case Number: 1:2018cv00235
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Karen K. Jones (Thomas, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(5). Plaintiff has until October 12, 2018 to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/25/2018. (ni)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss; File a Brief in Response to Motions; to Amend as of Right by Karen K. Jones. Responses due by 10/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Gross, Molly). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(5) by Walter Dalton, Kimberly Gold, Stephen Matheny, Trustees of Isothermal Community College. Responses due by 9/25/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope C, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support of 12(b)(6) 12(b)(5))(Gilley, Matthew). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Simpson Gross on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gross, Molly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thomas, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Walter Dalton; Kimberly Gold; Stephen Matheny; Trustees of Isothermal Community College answers due 9/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/28/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Walter Dalton, Kimberly Gold, Stephen Matheny, Trustees of Isothermal Community College. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilley, Matthew). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBITS C and D to the #1 Notice of Removal by Walter Dalton, Kimberly Gold, Stephen Matheny, Trustees of Isothermal Community College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Gilley, Matthew) Modified docket text on 8/27/2018. (maf)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-792. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3784644), filed by Kimberly Gold, Walter Dalton, Trustees of Isothermal Community College, Stephen Matheny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, *See Doc. No. #2 for Exhibits C and D*)(Gilley, Matthew) Modified on 8/27/2018 to reference additional exhibits. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
August 21, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Trustees of Isothermal Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Matheny
Represented By: Matthew J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Gold
Represented By: Matthew J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Dalton
Represented By: Matthew J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Isothermal Community College
Represented By: Matthew J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen K. Jones
Represented By: Molly Simpson Gross
Represented By: Michael Paul Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?