Fisher et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dallas Fisher and Cherie Fisher
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00255
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 23, 2018 Notice to Justin G. Day: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 10/30/2018. (maf)
October 23, 2018 Notice to Gregory F. Coleman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 10/30/2018. (maf)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 and #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Justin G. Day and Gregory F. Coleman are ADMITTED to represent Plaintiffs and practice before this Court while associated with local counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/23/2018. (maf)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin G. Day Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3832206. by Cherie Fisher, Dallas Fisher. (Bryson, Daniel). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory F. Coleman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3832197. by Cherie Fisher, Dallas Fisher. (Bryson, Daniel). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America (US Attorney and US Attorney General). NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to USAG) (maf)
September 10, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kent Bryson on behalf of Cherie Fisher, Dallas Fisher (Bryson, Daniel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3802637), filed by Dallas Fisher, Cherie Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Incident Report)(Bryson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Fisher
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Fisher
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?