Moran v. Polk County, et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Leah Moran and Leah Moran
Defendant: Polk County, Mr. Kyle Passmore, Defendant Unknown, Mr. Joshua J Kujawa, Ms. Shelley Stroup, Transylvania County Detention Center, Mr. Jerry Mann, Transylvania County, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Mr. Myles McCrary, Ms. Nichole Blackwell, Donald Hill, Joshua J. Kujawa, Robbie Worthy, Myles B. McCrary, John Doe, Kyle Passmore, Nichole Blackwell, Shelley Stroup, Jerry Mann and John Does
Case Number: 1:2018cv00300
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Leah Moran. Responses due by 1/4/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Morris, Thomas). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/16/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/20/2018. (ejb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Myles B. McCrary. (Hill, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Myles B. McCrary. Responses due by 1/3/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Hill, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Leah Moran. Responses due by 1/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Morris, Thomas). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Nichole Blackwell, Donald Hill, Joshua J. Kujawa, Jerry Mann, Kyle Passmore, Polk County, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Shelley Stroup, Transylvania County, Transylvania County Detention Center. Responses due by 1/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Polk County, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Transylvania County, and Transylvania County Detention Center, and said Defendants are allowed up to and including December 17, 2018 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/28/18. (emw)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Defendant McCrary's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and said Defendant is allowed up to and including December 29, 2018 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/27/18. (emw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Polk County, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Transylvania County, Transylvania County Detention Center. (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Hill, Joshua J. Kujawa, Jerry Mann, Kyle Passmore, Shelley Stroup re #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #9 Waiver of Service Executed, #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #6 Waiver of Service Executed, #8 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nichole Blackwell. Nichole Blackwell waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerry Mann. Jerry Mann waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kyle Passmore. Kyle Passmore waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shelley Stroup. Shelley Stroup waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua J. Kujawa. Joshua J. Kujawa waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donald Hill. Donald Hill waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Perrin, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Myles B. McCrary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting EOT)(Hill, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Luke Hill on behalf of Myles B. McCrary (Hill, William)
November 5, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf as referral judge. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (ejb).
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Donald Hill, Kyle Passmore, Nichole Blackwell, Jerry Mann, Myles McCrary, Shelley Stroup, Robbie Worthy and Joshua Kujawa on 11/05/2018 by Leah Moran. Waiver of Service due by 12/5/2018. (thh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Polk County, Polk County Sheriff's Department, Transylvania County, Transylvania County Detention Center. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (emw)
October 29, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3848381), filed by Leah Moran.(King, Brian) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/1/2018 with correct PDF). NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Polk County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kyle Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Joshua J Kujawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Shelley Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transylvania County Detention Center
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jerry Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transylvania County
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Myles McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Nichole Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hill
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua J. Kujawa
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Worthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myles B. McCrary
Represented By: William Luke Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Passmore
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Blackwell
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Stroup
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Mann
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Leah Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Moran
Represented By: Thomas Peter Morris
Represented By: Brian W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?