Lowery v. McDowell County Superior Court
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lowery
Defendant: McDowell County Superior Court, Melissa Adams, Leanna Lynch and Ronda Dobson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00319
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Jimmy Lowery. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/7/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against McDowell County Superior Court, Melissa Adams, Ronda Dobson, Leanna Lynch, filed by Jimmy Lowery.(kby)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #7 Order by Jimmy Lowery. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion (EDNC), #2 Complaint (EDNC), #3 Envelope)(kby)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to send Lowery a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 form authorized for use in this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Lowery shall have 21 days from entry of this Order to file a completed 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint on the correct form from either the Eastern or Western District of North Carolina and an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit, or pay the filing fee of $400.00. (Amended Pleadings and filing fee/IFP application due by 12/4/2018.) Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/13/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 11/27/2018. (ni)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:18-ct-03257. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Extension of Time and vacating #2 Order. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/6/2018. Copy served via US Mail: Jimmy Lowery 0902725, Foothills Correctional Institution, 5150 Western Ave., Morganton, NC 28655. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. (rth)
November 6, 2018 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 4 (rth)
October 30, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2 Order filed by Jimmy Lowery. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 11/6/2018 ORDER - ORDER regarding deficiency. Response to order due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/9/2018. Copy served via US Mail, along with forms: Jimmy Lowery 0902725, Foothills Correctional Institution, 5150 Western Ave., Morganton, NC 28655. (Castania, M) Modified on 11/6/2018. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Case Submitted for review. (Powers, S.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McDowell County Superior Court filed by Jimmy Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Powers, S.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. McDowell County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDowell County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanna Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?