Stillion v. Pelaez-Milian
Plaintiff: Stacy John Stillion
Defendant: Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian
Case Number: 1:2018cv00331
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. District Judge Martin Reidinger no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Cerwin, Todd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 ***Please Disregard, see Docket Entry #7 for Corrected Joint Stipulation of Consent.*** NOTICE of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Stacy John Stillion (Cerwin, Todd) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (kby).
December 13, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/3/2019. (emw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian.(Stutts, Caroline)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal filed with the State Court by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline)
November 16, 2018 Notice to Attorney Todd R. Cerwin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/23/2018. (ejb)
November 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3864396), filed by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Compliance, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(Stutts, Caroline)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline P. Stutts on behalf of Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillion v. Pelaez-Milian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian
Represented By: Caroline P. Stutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy John Stillion
Represented By: Todd R. Cerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?