Neighbor et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.

Plaintiff: Naomi Quillen and Pamela Neighbor
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00356
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: Max O Cogburn
1 Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Farzad, Ramona)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Responses due by 2/19/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Farzad, Ramona)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant's #5 Motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART, and Defendant is allowed up to and including 2/5/2019 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Except as allowed, Defendant's Motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/22/2019. (maf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farzad, Ramona). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. is allowed up to and including January 21, 2019 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/19/18. (emw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farzad, Ramona). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 14, 2018 Notice to Clifton A. Neal: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court and Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Admission/Registration Deadline is 12/21/2018. (maf)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Farzad, Ramona)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henderson County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 1809. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3886728), filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farzad, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neighbor et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Quillen
Represented By: Walter E. Daniels, III
Represented By: Clifton A. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Neighbor
Represented By: Walter E. Daniels, III
Represented By: Clifton A. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Ramona Farzad
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?