Natural Immunogenics Corp. v. Newport Trial Group et al

Plaintiff: Natural Immunogenics Corp.
Defendant: Newport Trial Group, Scott J. Ferrell, Ryan M. Ferrell, James B. Hardin, Victoria C. Knowles, Andrew Lee Baslow, Andrew Nilon, Sam Pfleg, Matthew Dronkers, Taylor Demulder, Sam Schoonover, Giovanni Sandoval and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018mc00003
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Motion to Compel

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joshua S. Furman for Natural Immunogenics Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/19/18. (emw)
January 12, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Instruction to non-party Carlos Negrete re: Deft Newport Trial Group's 1 MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/12/2018. (ejb) (Non-party Carlos Negrete served via mail and email as instructed by the Court.) Modified text on 1/12/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
January 11, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Stephanie A. Sperber for Newport Trial Group, Scott J. Ferrell, Ryan M. Ferrell, Victoria C. Knowles, Andrew Lee Baslow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/11/2018. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Immunogenics Corp. v. Newport Trial Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Immunogenics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Trial Group
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Ferrell
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan M. Ferrell
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria C. Knowles
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lee Baslow
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Nilon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Pfleg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dronkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Demulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?