Owen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Paul E. Owen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00015
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Paul E. Owen. United States of America served on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (McLean, Russell) (Main Document 6 replaced with correct PDF and modified text on 1/31/2019). NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Deleted Document, re-filed correct PDF, see document no. 6. Modified on 1/31/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 ***Please Disregard-Corrected Affidavit of Service filed at DE #6 *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul E. Owen (McLean, Russell) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (kby).
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 ***Please Disregard-Corrected Affidavit of Service filed at DE #6 *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul E. Owen (McLean, Russell) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (kby).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney and US Attorney General on behalf of United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (ni) Modified text on 1/17/2019. NEF regenerated (ni)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against the United States of America by Paul E. Owen with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3912243), filed by Paul Owen.(McLean, Russell) Modified text to reflect proper parties on 1/16/2019. NEF Regenerated. (maf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/16/2019) (thh). Modified on 1/16/2019 to replace with clearer image, NEF regenerated (thh).
January 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E. Owen
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?