Buchanan v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Karen Buchanan and Karen Renee Buchanan
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00030
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (ejb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Nancy A. Berryhill, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s) (ejb)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/04/2019. (ejb)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Renee Buchanan. (Fairbairn, Holly) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/29/2019 with corrected PDF.) NEF Regenerated. (ejb).
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security Disability) against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Karen Renee Buchanan.(Fairbairn, Holly) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/29/2019 with corrected PDF.) NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Buchanan
Represented By: Holly J. Fairbairn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Renee Buchanan
Represented By: Holly J. Fairbairn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?