Davis v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Michael S. Davis
Defendant: Charles J. Wilhelm, Charlene Parker, Van Duncan, Quentin Miller, John Doe #1, Western Surety Company, Sandra Cannon, Eva Fields, Tina Miller, Yasser Mir, John Doe #2 and Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00044
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Tina Miller served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Sutton, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Van Duncan waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Quentin Miller waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Charles J. Wilhelm waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sutton, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C. waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sutton, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Charlene Parker waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sutton, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Eva Fields waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sutton, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael S. Davis. Sandra Cannon waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Sutton, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Defendant Mir without prejudice by Michael S. Davis (Sutton, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Quentin Miller, Sandra Cannon, Van Duncan, Eva Fields,, Tina Miller, Yasser Mir, Charlene Parker, Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Yassir Mir Summons, #2 Van Duncan Summons, #3 Fields Summons, #4 Southeast Correctional Medical Group Summons, #5 Cannon Summons, #6 Parker Summons, #7 Tina Miller Summons)(thh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael S. Davis (Sutton, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C. (Peoples, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sandra Cannon (Peoples, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eva Fields (Peoples, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charlene Parker (Peoples, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Removal by Adam Peoples on behalf of Sandra Cannon, Eva Fields, Charlene Parker, Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C. (Peoples, Adam) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (ejb).
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Eva Fields. (Peoples, Adam) Modified text and added link to document no. 1 on 2/22/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Charlene Parker.(Peoples, Adam) Modified text and added link to document no. 1 on 2/22/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Sandra Cannon.(Peoples, Adam) Modified text and added link to document no. 1 on 2/22/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C. (Peoples, Adam) Modified text and added link to document no. 1 on 2/22/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Quentin Miller, Western Surety Company, Charles J. Wilhelm.(Freeman, James) Modified text on 2/22/2019. (ejb).
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3936541), filed by Charles J Wilhelm, Quentin Miller, Western Surety Company.(Freeman, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #1 Motion/Order Extending Statue of Limitations filed 08/16/2018 in State Court) (thh). Modified on 2/20/2019 to add missing document, NEF re-generated (thh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Wilhelm
Represented By: James Brandon Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Parker
Represented By: Adam Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Miller
Represented By: James Brandon Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: James Brandon Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Cannon
Represented By: Adam Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Fields
Represented By: Adam Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasser Mir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Correctional Medical Group, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: Adam Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Davis
Represented By: John Richard Sutton, Jr.
Represented By: John Richard Sutton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?