Wilkie v. Mitchell et al

Plaintiff: Robert V. Wilkie
Defendant: Marc Mitchell and Gregory Edward Refour
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (Fromknecht, Kenneth). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 20, 2019 ***Document terminated: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour terminated based on the #10 Notice of Withdrawal of document. (maf)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of intent not to file reply by Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Withdrawal of Motion by Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition)(Fromknecht, Kenneth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour. Responses due by 3/29/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Fromknecht, Kenneth). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Marc Mitchell served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; Gregory Edward Refour served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (maf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Mail ( #3 Order and NEF of #4 Summons Issued) addressed to Robert V. Wilkie at 3642 Miller Bridge Road, Connelly Springs, NC 28612 returned as undeliverable. (maf)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Mail (NEFs of #1 Complaint and #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis) addressed to Robert V. Wilkie at 3642 Miller Bridge Road, Connelly Springs, NC 28612 returned as undeliverable. (maf)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert V. Wilkie. Old address: 3642 Miller Bridge Road, Connelly Springs, NC 28612. New Address: 250 Pleasantview Loop, Morganton, NC 28655. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #2 Certificate of Service) (maf).
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Marc Mitchell, Gregory Edward Refour. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s) (ni)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/27/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (ni).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert V. Wilkie. (maf) Modified on 2/20/2019 to remove reference of referral to MJ. (maf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert V. Wilkie against Marc Mitchell and Gregory Edward Refour. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkie v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Mitchell
Represented By: Kenneth W. Fromknecht, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Edward Refour
Represented By: Kenneth W. Fromknecht, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?