Conner v. Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Robyn Conner
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00194
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Robyn Conner (Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (ejb).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd., filed by Robyn Conner.(Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (ejb).
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robyn Conner (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd. on 6/18/2019 by Robyn Conner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waiver of Service)(Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Robyn Conner (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4063144), filed by Robyn Conner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hormozdi, Shireen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Conner
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?