Brooks v. Serio

Plaintiff: Martin James Brooks
Defendant: Jennifer Serio
Case Number: 1:2019cv00209
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robert Brickley on behalf of Jennifer Serio (Brickley, John) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/13/2019) (ctb). NEF Regenerated on 8/14/2019 (kby).
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin James Brooks. Jennifer Serio waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Crisco, Ronnie)
June 28, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr., and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:19-cv-289 to 1:19-cv-209. Please use 1:19-cv-209 for all future pleadings. (brl)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jennifer Serio. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
June 25, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
June 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4072498), filed by Martin James Brooks.(Crisco, Ronnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Serio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Serio
Represented By: John Robert Brickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin James Brooks
Represented By: Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?