Harper v. Saul
Plaintiff: Barbara Harper
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00212
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added David F. Chermol for Barbara Harper. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/29/2019. (ejb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration (SSA) served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (reh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s)(khm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/29/2019. (khm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Chermol Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4110395. by Barbara Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certif good standing PA)(Eaglin, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (khm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Harper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eaglin, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Barbara Harper. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AC Denial of review)(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Harper
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?